Home >> Exam Tips >> Bank Exams Math Shortcut Tricks

Bank Exams Math Shortcut Tricks

Check out for Bank Exams Math Shortcut Tricks. Math Section is one of the time consuming Section in Banking Exams. Most of the students worry about this section in Bank & Other Competitive Exams because of its time-consuming nature. Also Most of the students search for the shortcut tricks for Maths where they don’t find such an impressive shortcut tricks. That’s why we are coming with some of the very useful Shortcut Tricks for your Bank Exams Maths Preparation. These Tricks, if you practice well, will help you to improve your speed in Math Section. Lets look at these cool Math Shortcut Tricks.

Math Shortcut Tricks

Bank Exams Math Shortcut Tricks

Before going to look at Math Shortcut Tricks, lets look at one example for easy multiplication process for two digit numbers.

Have you understand the technique. We hope so, because it is one of the simple trick to apply for multiplication process that most of the students don’t know.

Also Read: Successful Tips to Pass English Section in Bank & All Competitive Exams

Multiplication Tricks

The above mentioned Trick is one of the easiest method for calculation for two digit numbers if you master it. We are here providing few more Math Shortcut Tricks relating to multiplication, try to use most of these tricks to speed up your calculations.

  • Multiplication using multiples
    12 x 35
    = 12 x 5 x 7
    = 60 x 7
    = 420
  • Multiplication by distribution 
    12 x 17
    = (12 x 10) + (12 x 7) —> 12 is multiplied to both 10 & 7 (where 10+7=17)
    = 120 + 84
    = 204
  • Multiplication by “giving and taking”
    12 x 97
    = 12 x (100 – 3)
    = (12 x 100) – (12 x 3)
    = 1200 – 36
    = 1164
  • Multiplication by 5 –> take the half(0.5) then multiply by 10
    428 x 5
    = (428 x 1/2) x 10 = 428 x 0.5 x 10
    = 214 x 10
    = 2140
  • Multiplication by 10 —> just move the decimal point one place to the right
    26 x 10
    = 260 —> added one zero
  • Multiplication by 50 —> take the half(0.5) then multiply by 100
    46 x 50
    = (46/2) x 100 = 46 x 0.5 x 100
    = 23 x 100
    = 2300
  • Multiplication by 100 —> move the decimal point two places to the right
    36 x 100
    = 3600 —> added two zeroes
  • Multiplication by 500 —> take the half(0.5) then multiply by 1000
    42 x 500
    = 42/2 x 1000
    = 21 x 1000
    = 21,000
  • Multiplication by 25 —> use the analogy $1 = 4 x 25 cents
    25 x 14
    = (25 x 10) + (25 x 4) —> 250 + 100 —> $2.50 + $1
    = 350
  • Multiplication by 25 —> divide by 4 then multiply by 100
    36 x 25
    = (36/4) x 100
    = 9 x 100
    = 900
  • Multiplication by 11 if sum of digits is less than 10
    72 x 11
    = 7_2 —> the middle term = 7 + 2 = 9
    = place the middle term 9 between 7 & 2
    = 792
  • Multiplication by 11 if sum of digits is greater than 10
    87 x 11
    = 8_7 —> the middle term = 8 + 7 = 15
    because the middle term is greater than 10, use 5 then
    add 1 to the first term 8, which leads to the answer of
    = 957
  • Multiplication of 37 by the 3, 6, 9 until 27 series of numbers –> the “triple effect” 
    Solve 37 x 3
    multiply 7 by 3 = 21, knowing the last digit (1), just combine two more 1’s giving the triple digit answer 111  Solve 37 x 9
    multiply 7 by 9 = 63, knowing the last digit (3), just combine two more 3’s giving the triple digit answer 333Solve 37 x 21
    multiply 7 by 21 = 147, knowing the last digit (7), just combine two more 7’s giving the triple digit answer 777. 

  • Multiplication of the “dozen teens” group of numbers —
    (i.e. 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19) by ANY of the numbers within the group:

    solve 14 x 17
    4 x 7 = 28;  remember 8, carry 2
    14 + 7 = 21
    add 21 to whats is carried (2)
    giving the result 23
    form the answer by combinig 23 to what is remembered (8)
    giving the answer 238

     

  • Multiplication of numbers ending in 5 with difference of 10
    45 x 35
    first term = [(4 + 1) x 3] = 15; (4 is the first digit of 45 and 3 is the first digit of 35 –> add 1 to the higher first digit which is 4 in this case, then multiply the result by 3, giving 15)
    last term = 75
    combining the first term and last term,
    = 157575 x 85
    first term = (8 + 1) x 7 = 63
    last term = 75
    combining first and last terms,
    = 637515 x 25
    = 375
  • Multiplication of numbers ending in 5 with the same first terms (square of a number)
    25 x 25
    first term = (2 + 1) x 2 = 6
    last term = 25
    answer = 625 —> square of 2575 x 75
    first term = (7 + 1) x 7 = 56
    last term = 25
    answer = 5625 —> 75 squared

Also Check: IBPS PO Best Reference Books – New Syllabus

Division Tricks

We are here providing some Math Shortcut Tricks relating to Division, try to use most of these tricks to speed up your calculations.

Read: Quantitative Aptitude Book for Competitive Examinations

  • Division by parts —> imagine dividing $874 between two persons
    874/2
    = 800/2 + 74/2
    = 400 + 37
    = 437
  • Division using the factors of the divisor: “double division”
    70/14
    = (70/7)/2 —> 7 and 2 are the factors of 14
    = 10/2
    = 5
  • Division by using fractions:
    132/2
    = (100/2 + 32/2) —> break down into two fractions
    = (50 + 16)
    = 66
  • Division by 5 —> divide by 100 then multiply by 20
    1400/5
    = (1400/100) x 20
    = 14 x 20
    = 280
  • Division by 10 —> move the decimal point one place to the left
    0.5/10
    = 0.05 —> 5% is 50% divided by ten
  • Division by 50 —> divide by 100 then multiply by 2
    2100/50
    = (2100/100) x 2
    = 21 x 2
    = 42700/50
    = (700/100) x 2
    = 7 x 2
    = 14
  • Division by 100 —> move the decimal point two places to the left
    25/100
    = 0.25
  • Division by 500 —> divide by 100 then multiply by 0.2
    17/500
    = (17/100) x 0.2
    = 0.17 x 0.2
    = 0.034
  • Division by 25 —> divide by 100 then multiply by 4 
    500/25
    = (500/100) x 4
    = 5 x 4
    = 20
  • 750/25
    = (750/100) x 4
    = 7.5 x 2 x 2
    = 30

Also Look: Bank PO Exam Questions and Answers

Addition Tricks

We are here providing some Math Shortcut Tricks relating to Addition, try to use most of these tricks to speed up your calculations.

  • Addition of numbers close to multiples of ten (e.g. 19, 29, 89, 99 etc.)
    116 + 39
    = 116 + (40 – 1)
    = 116 + 40 – 1 —> add 40 then subtract 1
    = 156 – 1
    = 155116 + 97
    = 116 + (100 – 3)
    = 116 + 100 – 3 —> add 100 then subtract 3
    = 216 – 3
    = 213
  • Addition of decimals
    12.5 + 6.25
    = (12 + 0.5) + (6 + 0.25)
    = 12 + 6 + 0.5 + 0.25 —> add the integers then the decimals
    = 18 + 0.5 + 0.25
    = 18.75

Suggested: Banking Terms And Definitions One Must Know

Subtraction Tricks

We are here providing some Math Shortcut Tricks relating to Subtraction, try to use most of these tricks to speed up your calculations.

  • Subtraction by numbers close to 100, 200, 300, 400, etc.
    250 – 96
    = 250 – (100 – 4)
    = 250 – 100 + 4 —> subtract 100 then add 4
    = 150 + 4
    = 154250 – 196
    = 250 – (200 – 4)
    = 250 – 200 + 4 —> subtract 200 then add 4
    = 50 + 4
    = 54216 – 61
    = 216 – (100 – 39)
    = 216 – 100 + 39
    = 116 + (40 – 1) —> now the operation is addition, which is much easier
    = 156 – 1
    = 155
  • Subtraction of decimals
    47 – 9.9
    = 47 – (9 + 0.9) —> “double subtraction”
    = 47 – 9 – 0.9 —> subtract the integer first then the decimal
    = 38 – 0.9
    = 37.118.3 – 0.8
    = 18 + 0.3 – 0.8
    = (18 – 0.8) + 0.3 —> subtract 0.8 from 18 first
    = 17.2 + 0.3
    = 17.5

Have a Look at: Best Quantitative Aptitude Book for IBPS & All Other Competitive Exams

Percentages Tricks

We are here providing some Math Shortcut Tricks relating to Percentages, try to use most of these tricks to speed up your calculations.

  • 30% of 120
    = 10% x 3 x 120 —> it is much easier working with tens (10%)
    = 10% x 120 x 3
    = 12 x 3
    = 36
  • five percent of a number: 5%
    360 x 5%
    = 360 x 10%/2 —> take the 10% and divide by 2
    = 36/2
    = 18360 x 5%
    = 360 x 50%/10 —> take the half(0.5) and divide by 10
    = (360/2)/10
    = 180/10
    = 18
  • ninety percent of a number: 90%
    90% of 700
    = (100% – 10%) x 700
    = (100% x 700) – (10% x 700) —> 100% minus 10% of the number
    = 700 – 70
    = 630
  • What is 18 as a percentage of 50?
    = 18/50
    = (18/100) x 2 —> method: division by 50 (explained above)
    = 0.18 x 2
    = 0.36
    = 36%
  • What is 132 as a percentage of 200?
    = 132/200
    = (132/2)/100
    = [100/2 + 32/2]/100 —> solution by “double division”
    = (50 + 16)/100
    = 66/100
    = 0.66
    = 66%
  • What is 270 as a percentage of 300?
    = 270/300
    = [(270/3)/100] —> “double division” (using the factors of 300)
    = 90/100
    = 90%
  • What is 17 as percentage of 500?
    = 17/500
    = (17/50)/10
    = (17/100) x 2/10 —> solution using the procedure: division by 50
    = (0.17 x 2)/10
    = 0.34/10
    = 0.034
    = 3.4 %
  • percentages close to 100:
    95% of 700
    = (100% – 5%) x 700
    = (100% x 700) – (5% x 700)
    = 700 – (10% x 700/2) ——-> 5% is 10%/2
    = 700 – 70/2
    = 700 – 35
    = 665
  • percentages less than 10 percent:
    3% of 70
    = (3/100) x 70
    = (70/100) x 3 —> divide by 100 then multiply the percent value
    = 0.7 x 3
    = 2.1

Also Know About: IBPS Clerk Best Reference Books – New Syllabus

Decimals

To convert or express percentages as decimals, divide by 100 or simply just move the decimal point by two places to the left of the given number, thus:1% = 1/100 = 0.01

  • 2% = 2/100 = 0.02 = 1/50
  • 3% = 3/100 = 0.03
  • 4% = 4/100 = 0.04 = 1/25
  • 5% = 5/100 = 0.05 = 1/20
  • 6.25% = 6.25/100 = 0.0625 = 1/16
  • 7% = 7/100 = 0.07
  • 7.5% = 7.5/100 = 0.075
  • 10% = 10/100 = 0.1 = 1/10
  • 12.5% = 12.5/100 = 0.125 = 1/8
  • 20% = 0.2 = 1/5
  • 21% = 0.21
  • 25% = 0.25 = 1/4
  • 30% = 0.3 = 3/10
  • 33.33% = 33.33/100 = 0.3333 = 1/3
  • 37.5% = 0.375 = 3/8
  • 40% = 0.4 = 2/5
  • 50% = 0.5 = 1/2
  • 60% = 0.6 = 3/5
  • 62.5% = 0.625 = 5/8
  • 66.66% = 66.66/100 = 2/3
  • 75% = 0.75 = 3/4
  • 80% = 0.8 = 4/5
  • 87.5% = 0.875 = 7/8
  • 100% = 1
  • 125% = 1.25 = 1 1/4
  • 150% = 1.5 = 1 1/2
  • 200% = 2

Fractions

  • What is three quarters of 80?
    = 3/4 x 80
    = (80/4) x 3 —> divide by 4 then multiply by 3
    = 20 x 3
    = 60
  • How many quarters in two and a half?
    2.5/0.25
    = 10 —> there are 10 quarters in $2.50
  • Improper fractions:3/2 = 1 1/2 = 1.5 = 150%

    4/3 = 1 1/3 = 1.3333 = 133.33% —> useful number for volume of sphere, etc.

    9/5 = 1 4/5 = 1.8 = 180% —> conversion factor for Celsius/Fahrenheit temperatures.

  • V = 4/3 pi * r^3
    where:
    V = volume of sphere
    r = radius of sphere
  • F = (1.8 C) + 32
    where:
    F = temperature in Fahrenheit
    C = temperature in Celsius

Square Number

  • Tips 1: 2 Digit Number which ends in 5
    Step1: Multiply the first digit of number, with the next to its number. Ex: 35 is the number you want to square. 3 x 4 = 12
    Step2: Finally add 25 at the end of the result.Answer: 1225
  • Tips 2: Any 2 Digit Number
    Ex: 47
    Step1: Look for the nearest 10 boundary.
    3 from 47 to 50
    Step2: Since we went up 3 to 50, now go down 3 from 47 to 44.
    Step3: Now mentally multiply 44 x 50 = 2200 – 1st answer.
    Step4: 47 is 3 away from the 10 boundary 50, Square 3 as 9 – 2nd answer.
    Step5: Add the first and second answer, 2200 + 9Answer: 2209

Also Read: RS Aggarwal Reasoning Book Free Download pdf

Now have a look at some Math Sequential Tricks

Sequential Inputs of numbers with 8

1 x 8 + 1 = 9

12 x 8 + 2 = 98

123 x 8 + 3 = 987

1234 x 8 + 4 = 9876

12345 x 8 + 5 = 98765

123456 x 8 + 6 = 987654

1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543

12345678 x 8 + 8 = 98765432

123456789 x 8 + 9 = 987654321

 

Sequential 1’s with 9

1 x 9 + 2 = 11

12 x 9 + 3 = 111

123 x 9 + 4 = 1111

1234 x 9 + 5 = 11111

12345 x 9 + 6 = 111111

123456 x 9 + 7 = 1111111

1234567 x 9 + 8 = 11111111

12345678 x 9 + 9 = 111111111

123456789 x 9 + 10 = 1111111111

 

Sequential 8’s with 9

9 x 9 + 7 = 88

98 x 9 + 6 = 888

987 x 9 + 5 = 8888

9876 x 9 + 4 = 88888

98765 x 9 + 3 = 888888

987654 x 9 + 2 = 8888888

9876543 x 9 + 1 = 88888888

98765432 x 9 + 0 = 888888888

 

Numeric Palindrome with 1’s

1 x 1 = 1

11 x 11 = 121

111 x 111 = 12321

1111 x 1111 = 1234321

11111 x 11111 = 123454321

111111 x 111111 = 12345654321

1111111 x 1111111 = 1234567654321

11111111 x 11111111 = 123456787654321

111111111 x 111111111 = 12345678987654321

 

Without 8

12345679 x 9 = 111111111

12345679 x 18 = 222222222

12345679 x 27 = 333333333

12345679 x 36 = 444444444

12345679 x 45 = 555555555

12345679 x 54 = 666666666

12345679 x 63 = 777777777

12345679 x 72 = 888888888

12345679 x 81 = 999999999

 

Sequential Inputs of 9

9 x 9 = 81

99 x 99 = 9801

999 x 999 = 998001

9999 x 9999 = 99980001

99999 x 99999 = 9999800001

999999 x 999999 = 999998000001

9999999 x 9999999 = 99999980000001

99999999 x 99999999 = 9999999800000001

999999999 x 999999999 = 999999998000000001

We hope this Math Exam Shortcut Tricks will help you for your better preparation. Have a look at our website regularly for more Bank Exams Notifications & for more exam tricks. Also Share this article to your friends, who are preparing for Bank & Other Competitive exams

Check Also

Bank PO Exam Questions

Bank PO Exam Questions and Answers

Get Details of most commonly asked Bank PO Exam Questions and Answers. Here we are giving most …

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *